Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. The McClatchy Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50044 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The McClatchy Company
2100 Q Street
Sacramento, CA 95816 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 09/19 9:04 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50044 Closed. (btw) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Hearing vacated per Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 9/11/2019 . (lat) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Wed 09/11 10:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Show Cause, Order to Appear and
Mon 08/05 11:06 AM
Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause re: Failure to Prosecute . Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 02/26 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: The McClatchy Company dba The Charlotte Observer . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 02/25 10:09 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/22 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 02/22 2:39 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/22 11:34 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50044 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) The McClatchy Company [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:08 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50044 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |