Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:19-cv-00468
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2019
Re-opened:Mar 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 30, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2019 3:33 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Plutus Group LLC
Represented By
Lynn Warren Schleinat
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info
Nathan Allen, Jr
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Crimson Building Company LLC
8721 Airport Freeway Suite 100
North Richland Hills, TX 76180
Represented By
Robert W Hellner
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Justin P England
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant
Plutus Group LLC
Represented By
Lynn Warren Schleinat
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info
Nathan Allen, Jr
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Stephen K Yungblut
Pratt Yungblut
contact info
Plaintiff
Crimson Building Company LLC
8721 Airport Freeway Suite 100
North Richland Hills, TX 76180
Represented By
Patrick Kimble
Crimson Building Company LLC
contact info
Robert W Hellner
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Justin P England
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
ThirdParty Defendant
Lupo Construction LLC
Terminated: 05/15/2019
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Plutus Group LLC
Terminated: 05/15/2019
Represented By
Lynn Warren Schleinat
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info
Nathan Allen, Jr
Jones Allen & Fuquay LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, December 30, 2022
88 88 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 01/03 11:06 AM
ORDER granting87 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and causes of action asserted by the parties in this case are hereby DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice to refiling. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/30/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
87 87 motion Dismiss Thu 12/29 3:48 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Crimson Building Company LLC (Wilson, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order