Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 6:19-cr-00012
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Feb 23, 2019 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
Christopher James Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Stephen Christopher McMains
Attorney At Law
contact info
X Case Manager - Judge Ellington
contact info
Material Witness
Oscar Alexander Lira-Paredes
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Patricia Hubert Booth
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2019 2:51 AM CST
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Christopher James Rodriguez (1), filed. (idavis, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Oscar Alexander Lira-Paredes as to Christopher James Rodriguez, filed.(idavis, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 2/4/2019 as to Christopher James Rodriguez. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by Pretrial Services Agency. Deft states he was employed private counsel. Arraignment/Detention Hearings and further proceedings to be held upon arrival in the Corpus Christi Division. Defendant held without bond. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal and the U.S. Marshal is to transport Defendant to Corpus Christi for further proceedings. Appearances:Israel Cano, AUSA; (PSA: Ralph Garcia)(USPO:Sandra Barrios)(ERO:Dori Noriega) (Interpreter:Suzanne Buckley, present not needed)(DUSM: David Gavito) (CSO: Tony Arriaga)(bvasquez, 1)[10:12 - 10:30 AM] [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet; Date of Arrest: 2/3/19 as to Christopher James Rodriguez, filed.(jtabares, 1) (jtabares, 1). [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/4/2019) Unredacted attachment
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Christopher James Rodriguez, filed. [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
5 5 Arrest Warrant issued 1/23/19 Returned Executed on 2/3/19 in case as to Christopher James Rodriguez. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy. (yhausmann, 6) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant issued 1/23/19 Returned Executed on 2/3/19 in case as to Christopher James Rodriguez. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy, filed. (idavis, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
***SET HEARINGS as to Christopher James Rodriguez: Counsel Determination Hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. (KendraPearson, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
***SET HEARINGS RE: MATERIAL WITNESS OSCAR ALEXANDER LIRA-PAREDES: Status Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. (KendraPearson, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Christopher James Rodriguez, filed. (ecmiller, 1) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING as to Christopher James Rodriguez held on 2/11/2019. Defendant requests appointed counsel; financial affidavit previously executed. Court finds defendant qualifies for appointed counsel and an attorney will be appointed to represent the defendant. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances:AUSA Cody Barnes. USPO-Eloy Rivas. USM-Robin Richards. (Digital # 9:16:05-9:22:10)(ERO:frenchie carbia) (Interpreter:not used) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(KendraPearson, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Christopher James Rodriguez. Stephen C. McMains appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (AnnSalazar, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MATERIAL WITNESS OSCAR ALEXANDER LIRA-PAREDES as to Christopher James Rodriguez held on 2/12/2019. Discussion held. Agent Sandoval updates the Court on the status of the material witness who is in immigration custody. AUSA Hampton to issue a writ. Appearances:AUSA Julie Hampton. USM-Wade Ujhely; Ben Word. (Digital # 9:10:48-9:15:37)(ERO:sharon russell), filed.(KendraPearson, 2) . [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Christopher James Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, 6) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and/or Waiver of Detention Hearing without Prejudice by Christopher James Rodriguez, filed.(AnnSalazar, 2) [6:19-mj-00005]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
11 11 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Christopher James Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (fcarbia, 2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
12 12 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Christopher James Rodriguez, filed.(fcarbia, 2)
Related: [-]
13 13 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Christopher James Rodriguez. Arraignment set for 2/26/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B.Libby. Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge John D.Rainey. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge John D.Rainey. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B.Libby) Parties notified. (fcarbia, 2)
Related: [-]