Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Referred: Frank H Mccarthy
Case #: 4:14-cv-00062
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2014
Terminated:May 21, 2014
Last checked: Monday Dec 08, 2014 7:43 AM CST
Defendant
Harry Lentz, Jr
Represented By
David Robert Ross
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Joel L Wohlgemuth
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Ryan A Ray
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Defendant
Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc.
Represented By
David Robert Ross
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Joel L Wohlgemuth
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Ryan A Ray
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Defendant
Works & Lentz, Inc.
Represented By
David Robert Ross
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Joel L Wohlgemuth
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Ryan A Ray
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Plaintiff
Stefanie S Sinclair
Represented By
Joseph C Woltz
Pezold Barker & Woltz
contact info
Johnny Clyde Parker
University Of Tulsa College Of Law
contact info
Robert Kenneth Pezold
Pezold Barker & Woltz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2014
20 20 JUDGMENT by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Judgment of Dismissal , entering judgment in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff (terminates case) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting12 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number20 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2014
18 18 REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. ; (Ray, Ryan)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 12, 2014
17 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Stefanie S Sinclair ; (With attachments) (Pezold, Robert)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 05, 2014
16 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnny Clyde Parker on behalf of Stefanie S Sinclair (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2014
15 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Kenneth Pezold on behalf of Stefanie S Sinclair (Pezold, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2014
14 14 JURY DEMAND by Stefanie S Sinclair (Woltz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph C Woltz on behalf of Stefanie S Sinclair (Woltz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2014
12 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2014
11 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Works & Lentz, Inc. (Ross, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc. (Ross, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2014
8 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2014
7 7 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
6 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel L Wohlgemuth on behalf of Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Robert Ross on behalf of Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number CJ-2014-373 by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Harry Lentz, Jr, Works & Lentz of Tulsa, Inc., Works & Lentz, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2014
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Stefanie S Sinclair (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]