Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert H Cleland
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 3:19-cv-10564
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2019
Terminated:Apr 16, 2019
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2019 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Fritts
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Paul Olinzock
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Vik Shah
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
The Woodbridge Group
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.
Represented By
Alex L. Alexopoulos
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruthanne Flory
Represented By
Thomas R. Warnicke
Law Offices Of Thomas R. Warnicke, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/16 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ruthanne Flory (Warnicke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
6 6 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/28 2:47 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Extension of Time for Defendants to file an asnwer, ( Response due by 4/17/2019 ) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 03/28 12:06 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alex L. Alexopoulos appearing on behalf of Michael Fritts, Paul Olinzock, Vik Shah, The Woodbridge Group, Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. (Alexopoulos, Alex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/07 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Warnicke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Mon 02/25 4:29 PM
ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 02/25 7:37 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 02/25 7:37 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 24, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7121795 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lapeer - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Warnicke, Thomas)
Related: [-]