Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:19-cv-20718
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Terminated:Feb 26, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2019 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
EL CONQUISTADOR CONDOMINIUMS ASSOCIATION, INC.
14160 S.W. 86th Street
Miami, FL 33183
Defendant
ROBERT E PAIGE
9500 So. Dadeland Blvd. Suite 550
Miami, FL 33156
Defendant
PAIGE LAW GROUP, P.A.
9500 So. Dadeland Blvd. Suite 550
Miami, FL 33156
Defendant
Edith Spyke
3323 NE 163rd St. Suite 402
No. Miami Beach, FL 33160
Represented By
Samuel M. Sheldon
The Behar Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2 2 order Clerks Notice of Refund/Transfer-Filing Fee (by FINANCIAL SECTION) Wed 02/27 1:03 PM
Clerks Notice of Filing Fee transferred to 1:19-cv-20719 in the amount of $400.00 on 02/27/2019 re 1 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
1 1 order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Tue 02/26 6:00 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $400.00, receipt #113C-11421044, case filed date: 2/25/2019. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb)
Related: [-]