Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-14309

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda K Martin
Case #: 2:19-ap-00075
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Jacob May
Represented By
John Jacob May
contact info
Defendant
Betty Ruth May
Represented By
Betty Ruth May
contact info
Plaintiff
Primeforeclosures.com, LLC
Burch & Cracchiolo, PA 702 E. Osborn Road Suite 200
Phoenix, AZ 85014
Represented By
ALAN A. MEDA
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/26 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order Dismissing Adversary
31 31 order oDismissing Adversary Fri 09/24 3:41 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice signed on 9/24/2021 Related [+] . (MRS)
Related: [-] 29 Order Reopening Adversary and Reinstating it if Dismissed
court Close Adversary Fri 09/24 3:42 PM
Adversary Terminated . (MRS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
30 30 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 09/23 1:07 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
29 29 order oReopening and Reinstating Adversary If Dismissed Fri 08/20 8:03 AM
ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Reinstate and Reopen Adversary Proceeding signed on 8/19/2021 Related [+] . (MRS)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Reopen Adversary
28 28 other Certificate of Service Thu 08/19 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. Related [+] (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Reopen Adversary
27 27 motion Reopen Adversary (Motion to) Thu 08/19 11:04 AM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
26 26 order oStipulated Order Tue 08/13 3:47 PM
Stipulated Order to Close and Reinstate Adversary Proceeding signed on 8/13/2019 . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Tue 08/13 3:58 PM
Adversary Terminated . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
25 25 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 08/12 10:16 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
24 24 audio Wed 06/26 2:59 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 06/25/2019 11:00 AM ]. File Size [ 6,585 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:02 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1416343)).(Orosco, Leticia)
Related: [-]
23 23 vCal Minute Entry Tue 06/25 12:04 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/25/2019 Subject: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY BETTY RUTH MAY, JOHN JACOB MAY.. (vCal Hearing ID (1416343)). Related [+] (Pascua, Liz)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, June 20, 2019
22 22 notice Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of) Thu 06/20 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Betty Ruth May, John Jacob May. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
21 21 order oContinue Fri 05/10 1:02 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Continue Related [+] signed on 5/10/2019 Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ (BKM) . (Pascua, Liz)
Related: [-] 18
20 20 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Fri 05/10 11:25 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/13/2019 Subject: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY BETTY RUTH MAY, JOHN JACOB MAY.. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SIGNED ON 05 10-2019 HEARING CONTINUED TO 06 25-2019 AT 11:00 AM.. (vCal Hearing ID (1414091)). Related [+] Oral Argument set for 06/25/2019 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ (BKM) (Pascua, Liz)
Related: [-] 12
19 19 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 05/10 10:04 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC Related [+]. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Continue
18 18 motion Continue (Motion to) Fri 05/10 9:43 AM
Stipulated Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
17 17 answer Reply Wed 04/24 8:12 AM
Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Betty Ruth May, John Jacob May Related [+]. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-] 16 Response
Friday, April 12, 2019
16 16 answer Response Fri 04/12 3:12 PM
Response to Motion/Application to Dismiss Complaint to Except Debt from Discharge Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523 Related [+] filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)12
Thursday, March 28, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 03/30 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order
14 14 order oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC Thu 03/28 9:37 AM
ORDER signed on 3/28/2019 Related [+] Oral argument set for 6/13/2019 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 701, Phoenix, AZ (BKM) . (Pascua, Liz)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
12 12 motion Dismiss Complaint (Motion to) Wed 03/27 1:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Betty Ruth May, John Jacob May. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 03/27 10:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Deficiency Memo
11 11 court Deficiency Memo (QC Form) Mon 03/25 9:32 AM
Deficiency Memo Related [+] (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Thursday, March 21, 2019
10 10 motion Dismiss Complaint (Motion to) Thu 03/21 2:21 PM
Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Betty Ruth May, John Jacob May Related [+]. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
9 9 other Certificate of Service Wed 03/06 3:37 PM
Certificate of Service on John Jacob May filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. Related [+] (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint, 5 Request for Issuance of Replacement/Alias Summons
8 8 other Certificate of Service Wed 03/06 3:36 PM
Certificate of Service on Betty Ruth May filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. Related [+] (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint, 5 Request for Issuance of Replacement/Alias Summons
Thursday, February 28, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 03/02 10:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Replacement/Alias Summons Issued
6 6 court Replacement/Alias Summons Issued (Form) Thu 02/28 2:53 PM
Replacement/Alias Summons Issued . (Bryant, Renee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
5 5 cmp Request for Issuance of Replacement/Alias Summons Wed 02/27 9:40 AM
Request for Issuance of Replacement/Alias Summons filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/27 9:37 AM
Amended Complaint against Betty Ruth May, John Jacob May filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Tue 02/26 4:10 PM
Summons Issued . (Bryant, Renee)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/25 3:17 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/25 3:12 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-00075. Complaint (350.00 fee) against John Jacob May, Betty Ruth May filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Primeforeclosures.com, LLC Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) . (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]