California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:19-cv-00335
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:Nov 12, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2019 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Credito Real USA Finance, LLC
Represented By
Golareh Mahdavi
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
William Jonathan Denius, PHV
Killgore, Pearlman, Semanie, Denius & Squires, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Tolentino
Represented By
Trinette Gragirena Kent
Lemberg Law, LLC
contact info

GPO May 17 2019
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/16/2019 COMPELLING Plaintiff Crystal Tolentino to arbitrate the claims alleged in 1 Complaint, and DIRECTING the parties to submit their dispute to arbitration as outlined in the Arbitration Agreement. Parties shall use the American Arbitration Association to conduct the arbitration. This action, and all matters pending herein, are STAYED pending completion of the arbitration consistent with this Order. All hearings and status conferences in this action are hereby VACATED. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action to confirm, modify, correct, or vacate an arbitration award, or to issue subpoenas, if necessary. The parties shall file joint status reports with the Court every 60 days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings; alternatively, the parties may file appropriate dispositional documents to close this case. (Huang, H)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/12 1:48 PM
CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the parties'16 Stipulation for Dismissal and F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/12 5:39 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Crystal Tolentino.(Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
15 15 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/14 11:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the representation by counsel, the Court determined this case is settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, counsel is to file dispositional documents or a status report on or before November 13, 2019. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. Accordingly, all due dates and hearings set forth in this matter are VACATED and the STAY is lifted. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 08/14 9:47 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Crystal Tolentino. Dispositional Docs due by 10/14/2019. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 07/16 5:26 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Crystal Tolentino. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Stayed Fri 05/17 10:39 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/16/2019 COMPELLING Plaintiff Crystal Tolentino to arbitrate the claims alleged in1 Complaint, and DIRECTING the parties to submit their dispute to arbitration as outlined in the Arbitration Agreement. Parties shall use the American Arbitration Association to conduct the arbitration. This action, and all matters pending herein, are STAYED pending completion of the arbitration consistent with this Order. All hearings and status conferences in this action are hereby VACATED. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action to confirm, modify, correct, or vacate an arbitration award, or to issue subpoenas, if necessary. The parties shall file joint status reports with the Court every 60 days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings; alternatively, the parties may file appropriate dispositional documents to close this case. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/15 10:31 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION by Credito Real USA Finance, LLC.(Mahdavi, Golareh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
10 10 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Motion to Compel Tue 04/30 12:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the June 13, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Compel Arbitration (ECF No. 9) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
9 9 motion Compel Mon 04/29 2:37 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by Credito Real USA Finance, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Denius, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mike Thacker in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 2:29 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Credito Real USA Finance, LLC. (Denius, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 7:53 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Credito Real USA Finance, LLC served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
6 6 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 04/03 10:03 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/2/2019 ADDING attorney William Jonathan Denius, PHV for Credito Real USA Finance, LLC. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 04/03 8:42 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Less Than 28 Days by Credito Real USA Finance, LLC. (Mahdavi, Golareh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Wed 03/27 2:43 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Credito Real USA Finance, LLC for attorney William Jonathan Denius to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mahdavi, Golareh added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8182315) (Mahdavi, Golareh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Tue 02/26 9:18 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 02/26 9:17 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Credito Real USA Finance, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Trinette Gragirena Kent* *Lemberg Law, LLC* *3219 E. Camelback Rd, #558* *Phoenix, AZ 85018*. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/26 6:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Credito Real USA Finance, LLC by Crystal Tolentino. Attorney Kent, Trinette Gragirena added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8128658)(Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet