City of Florence v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45084 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 2:19-cv-00007 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Florence
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:29 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
Conflict Check run. (ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4277252), filed by City of Florence.(ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Purdue Pharma LP, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Purdue Frederick, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Endo Health, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Endo Pharmaceauticals, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Mallinckrodt, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Amerisourcebergen | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER: 1. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. merisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/2017.(ECO)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
Clerk's Note: Clerk emailed MDL Panel a copy of the Complaint and Docket Sheet on 2/5/2019. (ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | ||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (CTO-80) (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
6 | 6 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. CTO-80 filed in MDL Case Number MDL 2804. (TJZ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-00007. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |