City of Grayson v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45085 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 0:19-cv-00014 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Grayson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:17 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
Conflict Check run. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | ||
Clerk's Note: Clerk emailed MDL Panel a copy of the Complaint and docket sheet. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 101 pgs COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4277160), filed by City of Grayson.(JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Purdue Pharma, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Purdue Pharma Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Purdue Frederick, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Endo Health, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Mallinckrodt, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Amerisourcebergen | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER : 1) Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters re the case Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al as Frankfort 17-cv-70 to Judge Van Tatenhove; 2) a copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/17.(JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (CTO-80) (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
6 | 6 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO-80 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/21/19.(KSS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/25/2019.] | |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 0:19-cv-00014. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |