City of Nanticoke, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45081 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Middle, 3:19-cv-00190 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Value Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Generics Bidco I, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Nanticoke, Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:26 PM EDT |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4664709), filed by City of Nanticoke, Pennsylvania.(lh) (lh). [Transferred from pamd on 2/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 (2/4/2019) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (lh) [Transferred from pamd on 2/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons Packet | ||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Ciarimboli is instructed to ensure that all listed attorneys file for special admission (or move for general admission) (Attorney Budd, LaBlanc, Baughman, Saucer, Mansour, Peterson, Edison, Hill, Fuller, Quezon, Majestro, Mougey, Lamb, and Ferrell) and to submit ECF registration forms (all participating attorneys are to be e-filers unless he/she petitions the Chief Judge for exemption) (lg) [Transferred from pamd on 2/25/2019.] | ||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case forwarded to the MDL Panel for possible inclusion in MDL 2804. (bs) [Transferred from pamd on 2/25/2019.] | ||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-80) for MDL 2804 In Re: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION (jw) [Transferred from pamd on 2/25/2019.] | |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00190. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |