Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:19-ap-01036
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:Nov 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
CEF 2002 Aircraft, LLC
Represented By
CEF 2002 Aircraft, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Runway Liquidation, LLC
Represented By
Beth E. Levine
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2020
14 14 27 pgs misc Transcript Wed 02/12 2:20 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/23/19 at 11:08 AM RE: Pre-trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/6/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/9/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/6/2020. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/21 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1036 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
13 13 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 11/20 3:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 04, 2019
11 11 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 10/04 10:51 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/25/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
12 12 20 pgs misc Transcript Mon 10/21 3:31 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/2/19 at 2:05 PM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/2/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/10/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/4/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/2/2020. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 07/30 8:54 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/2/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 07/16 5:36 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/30/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 06/28 6:16 PM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,7
Friday, June 07, 2019
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 06/07 7:05 PM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,6
Friday, May 24, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 05/24 5:04 PM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, April 29, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 04/29 1:04 PM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,4
Friday, March 29, 2019
4 4 misc Stipulation Fri 03/29 4:12 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, March 28, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 03/28 12:56 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 02/27 3:55 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 3/29/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 02/26 7:56 PM
Adversary case 19-01036 Complaint against CEF 2002 Aircraft, LLC / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]