Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:19-ap-01042
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:Dec 13, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
FCI Group, Inc.
Represented By
FCI Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Runway Liquidation, LLC
Represented By
Beth E. Levine
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2020
20 20 misc Transcript Wed 02/12 2:20 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/23/19 at 11:08 AM RE: Pre-trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/6/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/9/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/6/2020. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 2:50 PM
Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 1
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/13 3:33 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1042 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 12:36 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by David W Meadows on behalf of Mediator. (Meadows, David)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Thu 12/05 12:33 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by David W Meadows on behalf of Mediator. (Meadows, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 12/05 12:15 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/8/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
15 15 misc Letter Wed 11/20 3:04 PM
Letter to Judge Chapman dated November 20, 2019 Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 13 ,14
Friday, November 15, 2019
14 14 misc Letter Fri 11/15 10:49 AM
Letter to Judge Chapman dated November 15, 2019 Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
13 13 misc Letter Fri 10/25 1:48 PM
Letter Letter to The Honorable Judge Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
11 11 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 10/04 10:53 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/25/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
12 12 misc Transcript Mon 10/21 3:32 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/2/19 at 2:05 PM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/2/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/10/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/4/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/2/2020. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
10 10 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 08/15 3:04 PM
Initial Pre-Trial Order signed on 8/15/2019 (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 07/16 5:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/30/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
8 8 answer None Wed 06/05 4:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Raymond H. Aver on behalf of FCI Group, Inc.. (Aver, Raymond)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 2:28 PM
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Raymond H. Aver Related [+] signed on 5/31/2019 (White, Greg)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
6 6 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Tue 05/28 7:49 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission "Motion For Admission To Practice, Pro Hac Vice" filed by Raymond H. Aver on behalf of FCI Group, Inc.. (Aver, Raymond)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 05/28 7:51 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 19-01042 scc] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13231964. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 05/21 9:55 AM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,4
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 04/30 8:59 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, March 28, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 03/28 1:03 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 02/27 3:59 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 3/29/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 02/26 8:18 PM
Adversary case 19-01042 Complaint against FCI Group, Inc. / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]