Runway Liquidation, LLC v. Galo Shoes Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01045 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Galo Shoes Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Runway Liquidation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/22 2:23 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1045 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 3/29/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01045 Complaint against Galo Shoes Inc. / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |