Runway Liquidation, LLC v. Qubit Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Qubit Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Runway Liquidation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/23/19 at 11:08 AM RE: Pre-trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/6/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/9/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/6/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 11/21 11:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1058 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/25/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/2/19 at 2:05 PM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/2/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/10/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/4/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/2/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/2/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Levine, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/30/2019 (check with court for location) (Levine, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 3/29/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01058 Complaint against Qubit Inc. / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth) |