Searcy, as Plan Administrator v. Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03314 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC, Defendant
17021 Aldine Westfield Rd.
Houston, TX 77073 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator, Plaintiff
420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1000
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/12 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3314 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/09 4:03 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/15 11:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC 3/9/2019. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/08 6:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC 3/4/2019. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Mon 03/04 6:10 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator ) (Assink, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Mon 03/04 8:54 AM
Summons Issued on Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC Date Issued 3/4/2019. (RuthGuerrero) |
|
Sunday, March 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 03/03 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 03/01 12:59 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Fri 03/01 12:32 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 02/27 10:33 AM
Adversary case 19-03314 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator against Baker Hughes Process and Pipeline Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Jones, Hunter) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |