Searcy, as Plan Administrator v. Redfish Rentals, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03320 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Redfish Rentals, Inc., Defendant
5306 Highway 311
Houma, LA 70360 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator, Plaintiff
420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1000
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Sun 06/02 7:45 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3320 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/29 2:17 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/29 5:23 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Redfish Rentals, Inc. (Abreo, Damian) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/08 6:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on Redfish Rentals, Inc. 3/4/2019. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Mon 03/04 6:14 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator ) (Assink, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Mon 03/04 9:11 AM
Summons Issued on Redfish Rentals, Inc. Date Issued 3/4/2019. (RuthGuerrero) |
|
Sunday, March 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 03/03 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 03/01 1:09 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Redfish Rentals, Inc.. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Fri 03/01 12:32 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 02/27 10:58 AM
Adversary case 19-03320 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator against Redfish Rentals, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Jones, Hunter) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |