California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 8:19-cv-00379
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2019
Terminated:Jul 03, 2019
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2019 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Chris A Jalian
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Leslie L Abbott
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Lico Giovanni Alvarado
Represented By
Caspar S Jivalagian
Kjt Law Group LLP
contact info
Christopher A Adams
Adams Employment Counsel
contact info
Vache A Thomassian
Kjt Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 20, 2020
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 08/20 1:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S LAWSUIT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case21 : Based on the stipulation between the parties, the Court hereby grants and approves the parties' stipulation for dismissal of the action in its entirety. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
21 21 stip Dismiss Case Tue 06/30 4:43 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lico Giovanni Alvarado.(Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff's Lawsuit
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
20 20 order Compel Arbitration Wed 07/03 2:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration (Doc. No. 13) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court compels arbitration as to claims one through seven. The Court severs Plaintiff's PAGA claim and stays the PAGA claim pending the arbitration of Plaintiff's other claims. No later than seven days after the conclusion of the arbitration proceedings, the parties shall file a status report with the Court. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/18 2:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE: COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay All Proceedings13 , set for 6/24/2019, is hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. by Judge Virginia A. Phillips THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
18 18 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 05/23 5:56 PM
REPLY in Support of PETITION to Compel Arbitration13 filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 05/21 4:33 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
Related: [-]
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/21 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS): COUNSEL ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, that the above matter has been reassigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Phillips sits in Courtroom 8A of the First Street Court House, 350 W. First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. The Court's Standing Order is issued herewith. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration13 is RESET for 6/24/2019 at 02:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
15 15 order Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34) Mon 05/20 5:13 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-00504 VAP(MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00379 VAP(MRWx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
14 14 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/15 8:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to PETITION to Compel Arbitration13 filed by Plaintiff Lico Giovanni Alvarado.(Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Alvarado In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
13 13 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 05/01 3:42 PM
PETITION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay,
Att: 2 Declaration of Chris Jalian in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay,
Att: 3 Declaration of Tammy Austin in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay,
Att: 4 Declaration of Tiffany Reynolds in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay,
Att: 5 Proposed Order re Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay
Thursday, April 11, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/11 9:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: (1) Defendant deadline to file its Motion to Compel Arbitration, shall be 5/1/2019. (2) Plaintiff's to file his opposition to Defendant's Motion shall be 5/15/2019; and (3) Defendant's to file its reply in support of its Motion shall be 5/24/2019. (4) Defendant shall notice the hearing on the Motion at the earliest motions date available on the Court's civil calendar, but no earlier than 6/21/2019 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
11 11 4 pgs stip Order Tue 04/02 11:20 AM
STIPULATION for Order to Set the Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc..(Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation re Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
10 10 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/06 12:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Cause of Action; and Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline for 30 Days9 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (1) The ninth cause of action for civil penalties under the California Private Attorney General Act is hereby dismissed; and (2) Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before 4/5/2019. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
9 9 stip Continue Thu 02/28 6:02 PM
Corrected STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading from March 6, 2019 to April 5, 2019; and Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Cause of Action filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc..(Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Cause of Action; and Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline for 30 Days
8 8 stip Continue Thu 02/28 5:04 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading from March 6, 2019 to April 5, 2019; and Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Cause of Action filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc..(Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Cause of Action; and Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline for 30 Days
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 02/28 11:39 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 02/28 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 02/27 6:07 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on February 27, 2019. (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/27 3:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. identifying Ferguson plc as Corporate Parent. (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/27 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., identifying Ferguson plc (Parent). (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/27 3:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/27 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019 01044455-CU-OE-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23287164 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Attorney Chris A Jalian added to party Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jalian, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - ADR Info Package,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - ADR Stipulation (Blank),
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action and Case Management Conference,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Notice of Reassignment,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal of Civil Action (State Court),
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Notice to Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court,
Att: 10 Declaration of Chris A. Jalian ISO Notice of Removal,
Att: 11 Declaration of Polly Foote ISO Notice of Removal,
Att: 12 Declaration of William Brundage ISO Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 02/28 11:44 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. Does 1-20. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Lico Giovanni Alvarado.1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL (lh)
Related: [-]