Parish of DeSoto v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45090 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Western, 5:19-cv-00153 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:13 PM EST |
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx LLC.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Parish of DeSoto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:55 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/26/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3870801) filed by Desoto Parish.(Attorney Ralph R Alexis, III added to party Desoto Parish(pty:pla))(aty,Alexis, Ralph) Modified on 2/7/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from lawd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet Counsel for Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet List of Defendants | ||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-80) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Reeves, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/26/2019.] | |
4 | 4 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 80, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00153. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |