County Commissioners of Charles County, Maryland v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45094 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:19-cv-00336 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:13 PM EST |
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Abbvie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County Commissioners of Charles County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:54 PM EDT |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7821317.), filed by County Commissioners of Charles County, Maryland.(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by County Commissioners of Charles County, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to 1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/21/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 2/26/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 8:19-cv-00336. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |