Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10466

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:19-ap-01079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2019
Terminated:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Polaris Handelsgesell Schaft
Represented By
Polaris Handelsgesell Schaft
contact info
Plaintiff
Runway Liquidation, LLC
Represented By
Beth E. Levine
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2020
6 6 misc Transcript Wed 02/12 2:28 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/23/19 at 11:08 AM RE: Pre-trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/6/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/9/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/6/2020. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/25 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1079 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
5 5 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 07/24 1:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 18, 2019
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 04/18 9:44 AM
Stipulation Further Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 3 ,1
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
3 3 misc Stipulation Tue 03/26 8:25 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, February 28, 2019
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 02/28 3:08 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 4/1/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 02/27 8:20 PM
Adversary case 19-01079 Complaint against Polaris Handelsgesell Schaft / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Beth E. Levine on behalf of Runway Liquidation, LLC. (Levine, Beth)
Related: [-]