Searcy, as Plan Administrator v. Titan Logistics and Support Services Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31146
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03326 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Titan Logistics and Support Services Ltd., Defendant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator, Plaintiff
420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1000
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/29 10:39 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3326 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/24 9:45 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 03/13 2:27 PM
Summons Issued on Titan Logistics and Support Services Ltd. Date Issued 3/13/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 03/12 1:38 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Titan Logistics and Support Services Ltd.. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate
Wed 03/06 9:58 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator ) (Assink, Bryan) |
|
Sunday, March 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 03/03 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Fri 03/01 12:32 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 02/27 3:43 PM
Adversary case 19-03326 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Joshua Searcy, as Plan Administrator against Titan Logistics and Support Services Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (Jones, Hunter) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |