Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:19-cv-00129
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Re-opened:Mar 01, 2021
Terminated:Jan 03, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
158 158 1 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 11/15 3:33 PM
ORDER: The court ORDERS Merwin Coleman, Minnesota DOC # 259761, to pay (and the agency having custody of him to automatically remit) 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $505.00 appeal fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/15/2023. (Copy mailed to Coleman and Minnesota Correctional Facility - Faribault - Inmate Trust Fund Department)(sej)
Related: [-]