Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:19-ap-50059
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2019
Terminated:May 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Google LLC
contact info
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
901 Cherry Avenue
San Bruno, CA 94066
Represented By
YouTube, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
6 6 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/29 9:15 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:19-ap-50059] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
5 5 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Mon 05/20 11:32 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Tue 03/05 11:30 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Google LLC; and YouTube, LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 03/05 10:45 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/12/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/19/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 4/4/2019. (btw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 03/04 3:38 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/04 1:32 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50059 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Google LLC, YouTube, LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - other