Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Twitter, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50062 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
1355 Market Street Suite 900
San Francisco, CA 94103 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/29 9:20 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:19-ap-50062] Closed. (btw) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Mon 05/20 11:27 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 03/05 11:32 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Twitter, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 03/05 10:52 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/12/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/19/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 4/4/2019. (btw) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 03/04 3:41 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/04 1:47 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50062 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Twitter, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |