RooR International BV et al v. Highland Convenience et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Joshua P Kolar |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00088 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jul 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2019 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Highland Convenience
|
|
Plaintiff
RooR International BV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sream Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe
Terminated: 06/28/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Clerks Judgment
Wed 02/05 8:52 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (lhc) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 02/05 8:51 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of RooR International BV against Highland Convenience in the amount of $15,954.00 with post-judgment interest at the rate of 1.55%. Defendant permanently restrained from infringing upon the RooR marks with the registration numbers 3,675,839, 2,307,176, and 2,235,638 directly or contributorily, in any manner, as outlined in Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/4/2020. (lhc) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Wed 02/05 8:44 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Highland Convenience by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc., as indicated in the default judgment entered separately this day. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/4/2020. (lhc) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 01/13 3:12 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Highland Convenience by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc.(Swift, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Value of Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Swift, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 01/13 1:27 PM
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE22 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Highland Convenience by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc. Plaintiffs are granted to 1/31/2020 to file a motion for default judgment against defendant Highland Convenience in conformity with the requirements set forth in my order of 12/12/2019 and those repeated today. Failure to timely file a motion in compliance will result in the dismissal of defendant Highland Convenience without prejudice and the closure of this case, without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 1/13/2020. (bas) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 01/09 1:06 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Highland Convenience by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc.(Swift, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_Value of Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Swift, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Clerks Entry of Default - form will be generated
Mon 12/30 3:01 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Highland Convenience* regarding20 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Sream Inc, RooR International BV. (bas) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 12/26 8:04 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Highland Convenience by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc. (Swift, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 12/13 2:09 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a motion for entry of default and a motion for default judgment against defendant Highland Convenience in conformity with the requirements set forth in this order no later than 1/10/20. Failure to timely file the motion will result in the dismissal of defendant Highland Convenience without prejudice and the closure of this case, without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/12/19. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/15 4:23 PM
|
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/14 1:01 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan G. Chance by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc.(Chance, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order to withdraw | ||
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/08 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harold C Moore on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moore, Harold) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/08 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Swift on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Swift, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside
Tue 07/30 1:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Set Aside Dismissal as to defendant Highland Convenience, and DENYING as to defendant John Doe. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/30/19. (ksp) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Set Aside
Mon 07/15 3:59 PM
MOTION to Set Aside9 Clerks Judgment,8 Order Dismissing Case, Rule 60 set aside motion by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc.(Chance, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/15 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RooR International BV, Sream Inc. Highland Convenience served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Chance, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Clerks Judgment
Fri 06/28 4:06 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (ksp) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 06/28 4:05 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), the claims of plaintiffs RooR International BV and Sream, Inc. against defendants Highland Convenience and John Doe are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to obtain timely service of process. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/28/19. (ksp) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Pursuant to Rule 4m - form will be generated
Wed 06/12 12:14 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to *Highland Convenience* that this action may be dismissed for failure to serve process. (tc) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/30 10:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - EFFECTIVE MAY 1, 2019 this Case is reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen, Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/29/19. (mlc) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/22 7:55 PM
NOTICE by RooR International BV, Sream Inc Notice of Related Cases (Chance, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/06 7:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Highland Convenience. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/06 7:51 AM
Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct) |
||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/05 9:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RooR International BV, Sream Inc. (Chance, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/05 9:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Grant Chance on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chance, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/05 9:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3828117.), filed by RooR International BV, Sream Inc.(Chance, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B to Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C to Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. D to Complaint, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement notice to PTO |