California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:19-cv-01614
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2019
Terminated:Mar 27, 2019
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2019 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Greenspire Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Carolyn Navarro
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Office Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
9 9 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Tue 4:38 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01614 DDP(FFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 3:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Greenspire Holdings, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 2:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 3:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro, (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 3:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23321597 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Navarro. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Carolyn Navarro(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]