Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liqui v. Porous Materials, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50114 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Porous Materials, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Transcript
Thu 06/13 11:16 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/7/2019 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/11/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, eScribers, at Telephone number (973)406-2250. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/20/2019. Redaction Request Due By 7/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/15/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/11/2019. (GM) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/10 2:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50114 Closed (RC) |
||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 06/05 11:11 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 05/29 9:26 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by AEI Winddown, Inc., Aquion Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Saturday, May 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/26 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/26 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Thu 05/23 7:49 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service for service of (1) [Signed] Entry of Default [Docket No. 12] and (2) [Signed] Judgment by Default [Docket No. 13] Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Thu 05/23 2:47 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Porous Materials, Inc. Signed on 5/23/2019. (RC) |
|
12 | 12
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 05/23 2:40 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Porous Materials, Inc. Signed on 5/23/2019. (RC) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 05/23 2:00 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 05/22 3:02 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Wed 05/22 2:57 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 05/17 4:45 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding [Signed] Order Scheduling Status Conference Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/16 2:27 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference. The status conference will be held on 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/16/2019. (RC) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 05/15 2:03 PM
Notice of (I) Reassignment of Judge and of (II) Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) to be Heard Before the Honorable Kevin Gross Filed by AEI Winddown, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (RC) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter (Adv)
Mon 04/22 2:22 PM
Letter Filed by Porous Materials, Inc. (RC) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 04/11 9:12 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Kevin Gross added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/12 1:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50114 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9230644, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 03/07 12:17 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Porous Materials, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/6/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 03/07 12:11 PM
Adversary case 19-50114 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liquidating Trustee against Porous Materials, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/5/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |