Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liqui v. Aerotek, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50116 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aerotek, Inc.
7301 Parkway Drive
Hanover, MD 21706 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/08 7:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50116 Closed (LMD) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 04/04 4:56 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/07 3:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50116 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9224783, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 03/07 12:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Aerotek, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/6/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 03/07 12:21 PM
Adversary case 19-50116 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liquidating Trustee against Aerotek, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/5/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |