Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00695
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2019 1:39 AM CST
Defendant
Mario Garcia-Franco (1)
Represented By
Dalila Padilla Paxton
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul T. Harle
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2019 3:11 AM CST
Friday, February 08, 2019
Arrest of Mario Garcia-Franco (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 2/8/2019 as to Mario Garcia-Franco. (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Mario Garcia-Franco. (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Mario Garcia-Franco (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Mario Garcia-Franco (1).By Judge Collis White. (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Mario Garcia-Franco. (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Mario Garcia-Franco. (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Initial Appearance as to Mario Garcia-Franco held on 2/11/2019 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 2/14/2019 2:00PM before Judge Collis White, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Mario Garcia-Franco (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - MCIENEGA.) (sjda) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Mario Garcia-Franco Dalila Padilla Paxton for Mario Garcia-Franco appointed.. Signed by Judge Collis White. (sj) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Mario Garcia-Franco (Paxton, Dalila) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of ASSERTION OF RIGHTS by Mario Garcia-Franco (Paxton, Dalila) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Mario Garcia-Franco. Signed by Judge Collis White. (aa) [2:19-mj-01681-CW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 2 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Mario Garcia-Franco (1) count(s) 1. (ls)
Related: [-] dacted Version