California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:19-cv-01630
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2019 9:12 PM PST
Defendant
Broker Solutions Inc
Represented By
Lindsay Lombard Buchanan
Weiner Brodsky Kider PC
contact info
Mitchel Howard Kider
Weiner Brodsky Kider PC
contact info
Joshua A Rosenthal
Medlin And Hargrave PC
contact info
Timothy Patrick Ofak
Weiner Brodsky Kider PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Malou Tutanes-Luster
Represented By
Jonathan W Ferris
Thomas And Solomon LLP
contact info
C Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Kyle J McGee
Grant And Eisenhofer PA
contact info
Laina M Herbert
Grant And Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Michael J Lingle
Thomas And Solomon LLP
contact info
John R Parker, Jr
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Annette M Gifford
Thomas And Solomon LLP
contact info
Nelson J Thomas
Dolin Thomas And Solomon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
ex rel. US Bankruptcy Court Edward R Roybal Fed Bldg & Courthouse 255 E Temple St
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Represented By
Douglas K. Chang
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Kimberly Friday
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Patty Arvielo
Terminated: 01/02/2019
Represented By
Mitchel Howard Kider
Weiner Brodsky Kider PC
contact info
Joshua A Rosenthal
Medlin And Hargrave PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 18, 2019
75 75 order Order Mon 3:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Admissions69 : THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorneys Nelson J. Thomas, Jonathan W. Ferris, Kyle J. McGee, Michael J. Lingle, and Timothy P. Ofak shall apply for admission pro hac vice promptly upon receipt of their Certificates of Good Standing, and no later than April 15, 2019 absent further approval of the Court. (bm)
Related: [-]
74 74 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 12:25 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy P. Ofak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Broker Solutions Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23390896) filed by Defendant Broker Solutions Inc. (Schiffman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 15, 2019
73 73 misc Response Fri 12:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Broker Solutions Incto Order to Show Cause66 (JOINT RESPONSE BY PARTIES)(Kider, Mitchel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
72 72 stip Amend/Correct Fri 10:24 AM
STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Plaintiff Malou Tutanes-Luster.(Cutter, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Defendants Response
Thursday, March 14, 2019
71 71 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 2:56 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Malou Tutanes-Luster (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23376502) Malou Tutanes-Luster. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
70 70 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 2:47 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laina Herbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Malou Tutanes-Luster (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23376389) Malou Tutanes-Luster. (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
69 69 stip Admissions Thu 2:12 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Admissions of Pro Hac Vice Attorneys filed by Relator Malou Tutanes-Luster.(Cutter, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
68 68 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 8:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lindsay L. Buchanan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Broker Solutions Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23372442) filed by Defendant Broker Solutions Inc. (Schiffman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
67 67 notice Appearance Thu 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joel Allen Schiffman on behalf of Defendant Broker Solutions Inc (Attorney Joel Allen Schiffman added to party Broker Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(Schiffman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
66 66 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 1:56 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/27/2019. (wm)
Related: [-]