Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liqui v. The Solaray Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10500
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50128 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Solaray Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aquion Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/21 11:31 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50128 Closed (LMD) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 06/19 4:39 PM
Notice of Dismissal // Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Complaint Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 06/05 11:11 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 05/29 9:26 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by AEI Winddown, Inc., Aquion Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 05/23 2:00 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 05/17 4:50 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding [Signed] Order Scheduling Status Conference Filed by Aquion Liquidating Trust. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/16 2:27 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference. The status conference will be held on 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/16/2019. (RC) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 05/15 2:03 PM
Notice of (I) Reassignment of Judge and of (II) Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) to be Heard Before the Honorable Kevin Gross Filed by AEI Winddown, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Seidl, Michael) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (RC) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 04/11 9:12 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Kevin Gross added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/07 3:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50128 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9224783, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 03/07 1:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant The Solaray Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/6/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 03/07 1:24 PM
Adversary case 19-50128 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Aquion Liquidating Trust, by and through its Liquidating Trustee against The Solaray Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/5/2019. (Seidl, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |