Member Case
Lead case is: 7:19-bk-22576

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:19-bk-22589
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Sep 22, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Neo Lights Holdings, Inc.
125 Park Ave
New York, NY 10017-5529
Represented By
Anne J. Penachio
Penachio Malara LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
77 77 ans Declaration Wed 09/23 3:40 PM
Declaration of Chapter 11 Trustee Regarding Post Confirmation Disbursements Made for the Period July 1, 2020 Through September 22, 2020 filed by Christopher A. Lynch on behalf of Counsel for Sandeep Gupta,Chapter 11 Trustee of Neo Lights Holdings, Inc.. (Lynch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
76 76 2 pgs order Order RE: Application, Final Decree Tue 09/22 1:13 PM
Final Decree Signed on 9/22/2020. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 75
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 09/22 1:35 PM
Case Closed. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
75 75 motion Application, Final Decree Mon 09/21 9:18 PM
Application for Final Decree Related [+] filed by Christopher A. Lynch on behalf of Counsel for Sandeep Gupta,Chapter 11 Trustee of Neo Lights Holdings, Inc.. (Lynch, Christopher)
Related: [-] 74
Att: 1 Proposed Order
74 74 misc Bankruptcy Closing Report Mon 09/21 9:15 PM
Bankruptcy Closing Report Filed by Christopher A. Lynch on behalf of Counsel for Sandeep Gupta,Chapter 11 Trustee of Neo Lights Holdings, Inc.. (Lynch, Christopher)
Related: [-]