Swift Harvest USA, LLC v. Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01746 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 04, 2019 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Swift Harvest USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 07/24 9:58 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dismissal | ||
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 07/24 9:21 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Other Filings - select - Notices - select -Voluntary Dismissal of Case pursuant to FRCP 41a(1). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/02 2:34 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: In light of the notice of settlement, filed June 28, 2919, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By AUGUST 14, 2019 the parties shall file either a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment. Failure to timely file a stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment shall result in the dismissal of this action. All pending hearings are now taken off calendar. The parties shall withdraw any pending motions/request no later than AUGUST 14, 2019, and failure to withdraw by that date will result in denial of the motions/requests without prejudice. (shb) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
notice
Settlement
Fri 06/28 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 05/30 5:04 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1);20 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The Court finds good cause shown and approves the stipulation. The time for PLAYGO ART & CRAFT MANUFACTORY LIMITED and PLAYGO TOYS ENTERPRISES LIMITED to answer or otherwise respond to SWIFT HARVEST USA, LLCs Complaint is hereby extended until June 29, 2019. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 05/29 10:50 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/29/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited, Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited.(Lee, Otto) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 05/22 3:18 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint(More than 30 days),18 . The time for PLAYGO ART & CRAFT MANUFACTORY LIMITED and PLAYGO TOYS ENTERPRISES LIMITED to answer or otherwise respond to SWIFT HARVEST USA, LLCs Complaint is hereby extended until May 30, 2019. Defendants Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited answer due 5/30/2019; Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited answer due 5/30/2019 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall (shb) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/16 9:38 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 30, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited, Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited.(Lee, Otto) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 05/06 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hana S Kim counsel for Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. Hana S. Kim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SWIFT HARVEST USA, LLC. (Kim, Hana) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 05/06 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas Joseph Alexakis counsel for Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. Adding Nicholas J. Alexakis as counsel of record for SWIFT HARVEST USA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SWIFT HARVEST USA, LLC. (Attorney Nicholas Joseph Alexakis added to party Swift Harvest USA, LLC(pty:pla))(Alexakis, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/16 10:44 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited answer now due 5/16/2019; Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited answer now due 5/16/2019, filed by Defendants Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited; Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited.(Attorney Leila N Sockolov added to party Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Leila N Sockolov added to party Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited(pty:dft))(Sockolov, Leila) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 03/25 1:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. as to Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited. Proof of Service of Summons re Certified Mail, Return Receipt not Returned nor signed by defendant (shb) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 03/25 1:43 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. as to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by Service re Certified Mail, Return Receipt Not Returned (shb) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
Fri 03/22 12:54 PM
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 ) mailed to Defendant Playgo Art &Craft Manufactory Limited:, 12th Floor, Tower 1, South Seas Centre 75 Mody Road, Tsim Sha Tsui East, Kowloon, Hong Kong on March 18, 2019 (shb) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
Fri 03/22 8:04 AM
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 ) mailed to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited, 12th Floor, Tower 1, South Seas Centre 75 Mody Road, Tsim Sha Tsui East, Kowloon, Hong Kong on 3/18/2019 (shb) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
7
pgs
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/13 8:29 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/11 5:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited. (et) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/11 5:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/11 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/08 5:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/08 5:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 03/08 5:50 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/08 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, identifying Aquawood LLC; Banzai International Limited; and Focus Brand Limited. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/08 5:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/08 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23347542 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Attorney Stephen L Raucher added to party Swift Harvest USA, LLC(pty:pla))(Raucher, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - C |