Nehemiah Kong v. Paul Don Farrell McBride et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00470 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2019 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kye Suk Kim
|
|
Defendant
Min Hak Kim
|
|
Defendant
Paul Don Farrell McBride
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vera Beth McBride
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Kong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 05/23 5:07 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.(Carson, Chris) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 04/22 1:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only18 served on 04/19/2019. (Carson, Chris) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 04/18 9:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement19 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Settlement
Wed 04/17 8:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.(Carson, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/17 8:07 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/16 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Paul Don Farrell McBride, Vera Beth McBride, identifying Nehemiah Kong, Min Hak Kim, Kye Suk Kim. (Vaughan, Cris) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 04/16 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Paul Don Farrell McBride, Vera Beth McBride.(Vaughan, Cris) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Mon 04/15 4:59 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Kye Suk Kim. (yl) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Kye Suk Kim filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/10 11:14 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vera Beth McBride answer now due 5/9/2019; Paul Don Farrell McBride answer now due 5/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Vera Beth McBride; Paul Don Farrell McBride.(Attorney Cris Campbell Vaughan added to party Paul Don Farrell McBride(pty:dft), Attorney Cris Campbell Vaughan added to party Vera Beth McBride(pty:dft))(Vaughan, Cris) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/03 7:12 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Paul Don Farrell McBride served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vera McBride - Wife in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/03 7:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Min Hak Kim served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kye Suk Kim - Wife in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/22 10:34 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Vera Beth McBride served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/22 10:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Kye Suk Kim served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/13 2:56 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/12 2:54 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kye Suk Kim, Min Hak Kim, Paul Don Farrell McBride, Vera Beth McBride. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/12 2:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/12 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/11 8:09 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/11 8:08 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/11 8:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/11 8:06 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23348620 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris) |