Mendez et al v. California Teachers Association et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01290 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, 20-15394 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2019 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Associated Chino Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Teachers Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norm Enfield
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fremont Unified District Teachers Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hayward Education Association-CTA-NEA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron McCowan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Education Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tustin Educators Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valley Center-Pauma Teachers Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kim Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Wayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bethany Mendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Leigh-Dick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
114 | 114 4 pgs USCA Case Number 20-15394 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for112 Notice of Appeal, filed by Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart, Angela Williams. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
113 | 113 Representation Statement by Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart, Angela Williams re112 Notice of Appeal, (Sweigart, Karin) Modified on 3/3/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). | |
112 | 112 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart, Angela Williams. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-14234868 paid.) (Sweigart, Karin) Modified on 3/3/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). |