County of Mohave v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45117 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Arizona, 3:19-cv-08048 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:15 PM EST |
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Impax Generics
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Mohave
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:54 PM EDT |
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16545222 filed by Mohave, County of. (Kilgard, Ron)(KEP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mohave, County of. (Kilgard, Ron) (KEP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16545222. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-8048 PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) Transferring Case to Northern District of Ohio Re MDL-2804. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/11/2019.] | |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 3:19-cv-08048. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |