City of Flint v. Actavis Pharma, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45122 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Michigan Eastern, 2:19-cv-10488 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:16 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Flint
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:07 PM EDT |
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (ATee) [Transferred from mied on 3/11/2019.] | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |