Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:19-cv-20940
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:0451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Terminated:Apr 25, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2019 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Anthony Angelillo
Represented By
Nnamdi Shaakir Jackson
The Law Office Of Nnamdi S. Jackson, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc.
Represented By
Nnamdi Shaakir Jackson
The Law Office Of Nnamdi S. Jackson, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Pamela I Perry
Pamela I. Perry, P.A. 1501 Venera Avenue Suite 300
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Plaintiff
Kyla Kahian
Represented By
R Edward Rosenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 02, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/02 4:12 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 05/02 1:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Kyla Kahian (Rosenberg, R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
13 13 order Administrative Order Fri 04/26 8:09 AM
Administrative Order on Mediator's Report and Denying all pending motions as moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
12 12 adr Mediation Report Tue 04/23 9:22 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Pamela I. Perry. Disposition: Settled in full.(Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
11 11 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/17 11:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants'10 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at Mediation. Defendants may appear telephonically for the mediation scheduled for April 22, 2019 in this case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2019. (jza)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/15 12:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Mediation by Anthony Angelillo, Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc..(Jackson, Nnamdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
Thursday, April 04, 2019
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/04 2:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. and Anthony Angelillo's8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. and Anthony Angelillo shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/4/2019. (jza)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/04 10:55 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Anthony Angelillo, Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc..(Jackson, Nnamdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/04 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nnamdi Shaakir Jackson on behalf of Anthony Angelillo, Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc.. Attorney Nnamdi Shaakir Jackson added to party Anthony Angelillo(pty:dft), Attorney Nnamdi Shaakir Jackson added to party Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Jackson, Nnamdi)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Fri 04/05 2:12 PM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 9 : Anthony Angelillo response due 4/26/2019; Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. response due 4/26/2019. (lk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
6 6 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 03/29 5:24 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 7:02 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kyla Kahian (Rosenberg, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
4 4 9 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/13 11:37 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Anthony Angelillo, Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. (ar2)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/12 12:12 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11465030, filed by Kyla Kahian.(Rosenberg, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)