Hawkins v. United States of America
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon J Quist |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2019 |
movant
Timothy Jay Hawkins Jr.
|
|
respondent
United States of America
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 05/16 1:45 PM
Certified Copy of Opinion4 , Order6 sent via U.S. Mail to Timothy Jay Hawkins, Jr. #54287-048 (mg) |
||
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/15 1:44 PM
ORDER AND JUDGMENT denying1 motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) and denying certificate of appealability; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Wed 05/15 1:40 PM
(DISREGARD) ORDER denying1 motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) and denying certificate of appealability; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 5/15/2019; disregarded, replaced by 12 (mg) |
|
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 05/15 1:39 PM
OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Tue 03/12 2:21 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 03/12 2:23 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Timothy Jay Hawkins, Jr. #54287-048 (mg) |
||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Tue 03/12 2:20 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) 1 with certificate of service filed by Timothy Jay Hawkins, Jr (mg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 03/12 2:18 PM
MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Timothy Jay Hawkins, Jr (mg) |