Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:19-cv-00081
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Terminated:Jun 21, 2019
Defendant
Bradley County, TN, District Attorney Office
Plaintiff
Michael Anthony Pope

GPO Jun 21 2019
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set in following order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/21/19. (c/m to Michael Anthony Pope #99001017, BRADLEY COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER, 2290 BLYTHE AVENUE SE, CLEVELAND, TN 37311)(ABF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/03 1:39 PM
MAIL addressed to Michael Anthony Pope RETURNED as Undeliverable re7 Memorandum & Opinion,8 Order Dismissing Case noting "NLH" (AYB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/21 4:11 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is DENIED, his motion to appoint counsel 3 is DENIED, and his pro se prisoners complaint for relief filed under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 is DISMISSED for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Because the Court CERTIFIED in the memorandum opinion that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/21/19. (c/m to Michael Anthony Pope #99001017, BRADLEY COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER, 2290 BLYTHE AVENUE SE, CLEVELAND, TN 37311)(ABF)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 06/21 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set in following order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/21/19. (c/m to Michael Anthony Pope #99001017, BRADLEY COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER, 2290 BLYTHE AVENUE SE, CLEVELAND, TN 37311)(ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
6 6 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/15 3:51 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Anthony Pope re5 Order (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/02 10:06 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff has not paid the required $400.00 filing fee, nor has be submitted the proper documents to proceed in forma pauperis. Specifically, Plaintiff has not filed a certified copy of his inmate trust account for the previous six-month period, nor has he filed an appropriate § 1983 complaint. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a standard § 1983 form to Plaintiff at his current address at the Bradley County Justice Center. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/2/19. (c/m to Michael Anthony Pope#99001017, BRADLEY COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER, 2290 BLYTHE AVENUE SE, CLEVELAND, TN 37311)(ABF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
4 4 notice Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Tue 03/12 10:58 AM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (aws, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 03/12 10:57 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Anthony Pope. (aws, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Tue 03/12 10:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Anthony Pope. (aws, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Anthony Pope.(aws, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope