Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Referred: Kelly F Pate
Case #: 3:19-cv-00175
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2019 3:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Randy Moore
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Randall C. Morgan
Hill Hill Carter Franco Cole & Black
contact info
Defendant
William Lane
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Walker
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Charles David Stubbs
Stubbs, Sills & Frye, PC
contact info
Defendant
The Randolph County Commission
Randolph County Commission Office 12 Broad Street East 12 Broad Street East
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Donnie Strain
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Bernard Sheppard
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Randolph County, Alabama
Randolph County Commission Office 12 Broad Street East
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nathaniel Morrow
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jody McDaniel
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jimmy Johnson
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Greg Johnson
Deputy Sheriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jean Dot
Deputy Sheriff, in her individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
David Cofield
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Larry Clark, Jr.
Deputy Sherriff, in his individual capacity Randolph Co. Sheriff's Office 1 N Main Street
Wedowee, AL 36278
Represented By
Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Webb & Eley, PC
contact info
Todd A. Brown
Webb & Eley, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Jack Almond
Represented By
Heather Newsom Leonard
Heather Leonard, PC
contact info
John Michael Segrest
The Segrest Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Roberts Almond
Represented By
Heather Newsom Leonard
Heather Leonard, PC
contact info
John Michael Segrest
The Segrest Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
355 355 motion Attorney Fees Wed 05/07 10:47 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Mike Segrest. (Englehart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supp. Declaration of Mike Segrest,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of David Martin,
Att: 3 Declaration of David P. Martin
354 354 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/07 8:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to352 Sealed Document by Kevin Walker. (Stubbs, Charles)
Related: [-]
353 353 order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 05/07 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is an Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal an Unredacted "Attorney Mike Segrest's Memorandum of Law Regarding the Legal Issues Identified in the Court's March 31, 2025 Order (Doc. 346)." (Doc. 351 .) For good cause it is ORDERED that the Motion (doc. 351 ) is GRANTED. Entered by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/7/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
352 352 misc Sealed Document Wed 05/07 9:12 AM
(UNREDACTED) Memorandum of Law Regarding the Legal Issues Identified in the Court's346 Order filed by Mike Segrest. (BES)
Related: [-]
351 351 motion Seal Wed 05/07 9:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal an Unredacted Memorandum of Law by Mike Segrest.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL)
Saturday, May 03, 2025
350 350 respoth Response to Order Sat 05/03 2:06 AM
Response to Order re346 Order,,, Attorney Mike Segrest's Memorandum of Law re: the Legal Issues Identified in the Court's March 31, 2025 Order (doc. 346) filed by Mike Segrest. (Englehart, John)
Related: [-]