Jones v. State of Alabama
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Steele |
Referred: | William E Cassady |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00059 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 08, 2014 1:32 PM CST |
Defendant
Robert Bentley
|
|
Defendant
State of Alabama
|
|
Defendant
Luther Strange
|
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Jo Jones
P. O. Box 282
Mobile, AL 36601 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 04/04 1:59 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:20 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Jo Jones Mandate issued 3/31/16 ; USCA Case Number 14-13573 (jal) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/02 3:27 PM
OPINION of USCA as to20 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Jo Jones AFFIRMED, (Mandate to issue at a later date). (jal) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 10/07 2:51 PM
Appeal Remark re20 Notice of Appeal : USCA Case Number 15-13573 EE, Appellant has filed Certificate of Interested Persons styled to the USCA. Mailed to USCA. (jal) |
||
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 09/29 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address to 420 First Ave., Saraland AL 36571 by Beverly Jo Jones (tgw) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 08/18 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re20 Notice of Appeal filed by Beverly Jo Jones. USCA Case Number 15-13573 (jal) |
|
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Tue 08/18 2:59 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:20 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-13573 The entire record on appeal is available electronically (jal) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 08/10 3:48 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re8 Amended Complaint filed by Beverly Jo Jones,1 Complaint filed by Beverly Jo Jones,19 Judgment,17 Objection to Report and Recommendations,20 Notice of Appeal,18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Judge Appealed: Judge Steele, Court Reporter: No Hearings, Fee Not Paid (jal) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Mon 08/10 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Judgment,18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Beverly Jo Jones. (Not Paid) (jal) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment - Dismissing as Frivolous
Wed 07/08 11:31 AM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff Beverly Jo Jones'action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/8/2015. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/08 11:28 AM
ORDER ADOPTING the16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that this action be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/8/2015. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/06 11:20 AM
OBJECTION to16 Report and Recommendations by Beverly Jo Jones. Referred to Judge Steele. (sdb) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/26 2:54 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re8 Amended Complaint filed by Beverly Jo Jones. It is recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice, prior to service of process, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as the Court lacks jurisdiction over the claim under the Rooker-Feldman doctrine. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/30/2015. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
Saturday, June 20, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/22 10:28 AM
MOTION for Service of Summons by Beverly Jo Jones. - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw) |
|
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration of MJ Order
Tue 02/10 11:47 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying13 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order. For those same reasons given in the Order filed November 26, 2014 (Doc. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/10/2015. (Cassady, William) |
|
Friday, December 12, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order
Mon 12/15 3:39 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re12 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Beverly Jo Jones. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (sdb) |
|
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 11/26 1:35 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/25/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (mbp) |
|
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 11/10 8:33 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Points to Consider by Beverly Jo Jones. - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw) |
|
Tuesday, August 26, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Strike
Tue 08/26 12:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting9 Motion to Strike. Doc. 9 is considered a motion to withdraw the motion for appointment of counsel and is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/26/2014. (Cassady, William) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 08/26 9:01 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 MOTION requesting motion (Doc. 7) to be Stricken from the Record - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw) |
||
Monday, August 25, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION requesting motion (Doc. 7) to be Stricken from the Record by Beverly Jo Jones. | |
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Bentley, Luther Strange filed by Beverly Jo Jones. - Ref to MJ/Cassady (tgw) | |
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Appoint Pete J. Vallas as Counsel by Beverly Jo Jones. - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw) | |
Friday, March 07, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT ("Complaint For Injunctive Relief, Re-Appointment Of Contracted Attorney") by Beverly Jo Jones. - Ref to Judge Steele (tgw) Modified on 3/24/2014 (tgw). | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Beverly Jo Jones (tgw) | |
Wednesday, February 26, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold service pending a review of the claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/26/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) | |
Friday, February 21, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Jo Jones. - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tgw) | |
Tuesday, February 18, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Order directing the Plaintiff by 3/14/2014 to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. The Clerk is directed to return to the Plaintiff the $5.00 money order that was received along with the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/18/2014. Copy of order, ifp motion & $5.00 money order mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) | |
Thursday, February 13, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against State of Alabama filed by Beverly Jo Jones. (tgw) | |
Att: 1 Order entered in Misc Case No. 09-1002 |