Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary Ann Whipple
Case #: 5:19-ap-05022
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Terminated:Oct 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neidert Fabricating, Inc.
453 Gates Street
Doylestown, OH 44230
Represented By
Neidert Fabricating, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Ashley J. Jericho
Mcdonald Hopkins PLC
contact info
Sean D. Malloy
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 10/28 8:44 AM
Disposition of Adversary 5:19-ap-5022 (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/28 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5022 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
26 26 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/09 6:16 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2019
25 25 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Mon 09/30 12:22 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, September 27, 2019
24 24 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Fri 09/27 11:13 AM
Third Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 9/27/2019 Related [+]. Plaintiff must file either a dismissal entry or aStatus Report on or before October 11, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 26, 2019
23 23 court Proceeding Memo Thu 09/26 3:36 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 9/26/19. Parties have agreed to settle the complaint. Plf is awaiting settlement check. Dismissal Entry or Status Report due 14 days. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, August 15, 2019
22 22 answer Reply Thu 08/15 3:46 PM
Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Motion for Leave to Deny Asserted Discovery Admissions Filed by Neidert Fabricating, Inc. Related [+] (Steel, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 16 Response
Saturday, August 10, 2019
21 21 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sun 08/11 12:23 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 08/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, August 08, 2019
20 20 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Fri 08/09 12:20 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 08/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
19 19 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 08/08 4:39 PM
Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 8/8/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Telephone appearances will be permitted with separate 24-hour advance notice to the court. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
18 18 court Proceeding Memo Thu 08/08 1:53 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 8/8/19. Adjourned to 9/26/19 at 10:30 AM. No further scheduling pending further pretrial conference. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
17 17 court Proceeding Memo Thu 08/08 11:03 AM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 8/8/19. 1. Any reply due by 8/15/19.2. Motion will be decsional thereafter, reply or no reply. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Neidert Fabricating, Inc.
16 16 answer Response Thu 08/08 9:26 AM
Response to Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Deny Asserted Discovery Admissions Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
15 15 order Set Hearing (PDF) Tue 08/06 4:47 PM
Order to Set Hearing Signed on 8/6/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. This adversary proceeding comes before the court upon the Motion for Leave to Deny Asserted Discovery Admissions [Doc #13] filed by Defendant. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Motion
Thursday, August 01, 2019
14 14 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Thu 08/01 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY: Order not uploaded with filing. Upload immediately using courts "Order Upload" menu. Related [+] (mshai)
Related: [-] 13 Motion
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
13 13 motion Generic Motion Wed 07/31 4:48 PM
Motion for Leave to Deny Asserted Discovery Admissions Filed by Neidert Fabricating, Inc. (Steel, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/15 1:42 PM
Supplemental Answer to Complaint Filed by Neidert Fabricating, Inc.. (Steel, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2019
11 11 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Mon 05/06 12:19 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, May 03, 2019
10 10 order Set Hearing (PDF) Fri 05/03 11:28 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 5/3/2019 Related [+]. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report(s) are due by 8/30/19. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report(s) are due by 9/30/19. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by 7/31/19. Defendant must file a Fed. R. Bank. P. 7012(b) statement as to consent, as a supplement to its answer, on or before 5/16/19. The deadline to file Amended Pleadings without separate and further leave of court is 7/31/19. Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 02, 2019
9 9 court Proceeding Memo Thu 05/02 2:19 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 5/2/19. Adjourned to 8/8/19 at 10:30 AM. Discovery cutoff 7/31/19 - non expert. 1 Def. to file Rule 7012(b) statement re consent, as supplement to answer. Due 14 days. 2. Def. intends to file Rule 36(b) motion for withdrawal of deemed admissions. 3. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: 8/30/19 for Plff and 9/30/19 for Def. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 4:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Neidert Fabricating, Inc.. (Steel, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
7 7 misc Document Wed 04/17 5:02 PM
Document Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 1
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/17 4:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Neidert Fabricating, Inc.. (Steel, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
5 5 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sat 03/16 12:21 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, March 14, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/14 10:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on Neidert Fabricating, Inc. 3/14/2019 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 03/14 8:28 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Neidert Fabricating, Inc. Answer due 4/15/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toledo AP procedures memo
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Wed 03/13 12:22 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+]. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Case Reassigned Wed 03/13 1:15 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (bvohl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 4:13 PM
Adversary case 19-05022 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Neidert Fabricating, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A