Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee v. R & T Energy Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03350 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
R & T Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 09/13 12:30 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3350 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/12 10:36 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Wed 03/27 2:55 PM
Notice - Notice of Dismissal of Complaint . Filed by Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate
Thu 03/21 5:08 PM
Certificate - Certificate of Service (Filed By Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee ) (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 03/20 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/20/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 03/19 9:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on R & T Energy Services, Inc. 3/18/2019. (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Mon 03/18 3:12 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Fri 03/15 12:10 PM
Summons Issued on R & T Energy Services, Inc. Date Issued 3/15/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 03/13 4:22 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on R & T Energy Services, Inc.. (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Tue 03/12 5:40 PM
Adversary case 19-03350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drew McManigle, Liquidating Trustee against R & T Energy Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |