Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Clarence Cooper
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:19-cv-01123
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Re-opened:Mar 25, 2021
Terminated:Jul 07, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2019 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark Thomas Churchwell
Defendant
All American Quality Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Patrick Morris
Meadows & Macie, P.C.
contact info
Rodney Glenn Meadows
Meadows & Macie, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sierra Gaines
Represented By
Rachel Berlin
Buckley Beal, LLP
contact info
Rachel Berlin Benjamin
Buckley Beal, LLP
contact info
Anita K. Balasubramanian
Buckley Beal, LLP
contact info
Edward D. Buckley
Buckley Beal, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 08, 2021
68 68 order Judgment - Default Thu 07/08 8:33 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered against Mark Thomas Churchwell. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/08 8:36 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Thomas Churchwell re67 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,68 Order-Default Judgment. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
67 67 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Final Report and Recommendation Thu 07/08 8:15 AM
ORDER adopting64 Final Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part50 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that default judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Churchwell as to Counts IV-VI, VIII, and IX of the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is hereby AWARDED $40,000 in compensatory damages, $10,000 in punitive damages, and $70,205.62 in attorneys fees and costs. Count III of the Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant Churchwell at his last known mailing address in the record. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/7/2021. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 07/08 8:35 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]