Iberville Parish Council v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45140 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:19-cv-00121 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Rowan
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kappor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karen Hill
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alec Burlakoff
|
|
Defendant
Michael Babich
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iberville Parish Council
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:02 PM EDT |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 27 pgs NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, Case Number 78598. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1904620), filed by McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice of Removal | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) Modified on 2/27/2019 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
MOTION(S) REFERRED:4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Anda, Inc. (Dillard, Craig) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
MOTION(S) REFERRED:8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, orOtherwise Respond to the Complaint. McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation without waiver of any defenses, shall have up to, through and including 60 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, should any party file one, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Anda, Inc..(Dillard, Craig) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
MOTION(S) REFERRED:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to all Manufacturing Defendants . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Additional Extension of Time for all Manufacturing Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Rookard, Kelly) Modified on 3/4/2019 to edit the text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting8 Unopposed Motion of Defendant Anda, Inc. for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Anda, Inc. without waiver of any defenses, shall have up to, through and including 60 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, should any party file one, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 Letter to Attorney Craig D. Dillard regarding Michael Rahmn who is Co-Counsel for party Defendant, Anda Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for all Manufacturing Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings. The Manufacturing Defendants (Purdue Pharma L.P.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho- McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.;Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; and Insys Therapeutics, Inc.), without waiver of any defenses, shall have up to, through and including 60 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, should any party file one, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (SWE) Modified on 3/14/2019 to replace document (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Minute Entry Order NEF | ||
14 | 14 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic Letter Sent.(SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/14/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certified Transfer Order | ||
15 | 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00121. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |