Ezra Holdings Limited v. United Overseas Bank Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22405
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22405
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:19-ap-08240 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
United Overseas Bank Limited
777 South Figueroa Street Suite #518
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ezra Holdings Limited
EisnerAmper LLP 750 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/21 10:52 AM
Adversary Case 7:19-ap-8240 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/24 8:21 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 06/25 11:22 AM
Second Stipulation and Order signed on 6/24/2019. (Rai, Narotam) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Mon 06/24 3:15 PM
Stipulation / Second Stipulation and Proposed Order Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 06/03 11:23 AM
Stipulation and Order signed on 5/31/2019. (Rai, Narotam) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/31 9:37 AM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
other
Certificate, Service
Tue 05/28 2:06 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Declaration
Wed 05/22 8:55 PM
Declaration of Brian D. Glueckstein in Support of Motion of United Overseas Bank Limited to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Loan Facility | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - MML Facility | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Confirmation Order | ||
9 | 9
answer
Declaration
Wed 05/22 8:52 PM
Declaration of Peter Lim Kim Yong in Support of Motion of United Overseas Bank Limited to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/22 8:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Motion of United Overseas Bank Limited to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 05/22 8:41 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement of Defendant United Overseas Bank Limited . Filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/22 8:19 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Appearance of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of United Overseas Bank Limited. (Glueckstein, Brian) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 04/26 12:14 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. with hearing to be held on 6/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 1:31 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 03/21 2:52 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 03/20 8:36 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 4/19/2019. (Rai, Narotam) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 03/15 12:56 PM
Adversary case 19-08240 Complaint against United Overseas Bank Limited / Complaint to: (I) Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Holdings Limited. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 03/15 1:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-08240 rdd] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13090851. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |