Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:George C Smith
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:19-cv-00977
Nature of Suit490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV
Cause47:553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2019
Terminated:Aug 21, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2019 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Brad Marlatt
62979 Merrick Road
Cambridge, OH 43725
Defendant
Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC
c/o 62979 Merrick Rd
Cambridge, OH 43725
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions Inc
407 E Pennsylvania Blvd
Feasterville, PA 19053
Represented By
Jeffrey L Koberg
Law Offices Of Timothy M Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/10 9:05 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Inc re12 Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment on Both Defendants (Koberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
12 12 order Judgment Thu 08/22 9:23 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Order signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/21/2019. (mdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 08/22 8:59 AM
OPINION and ORDER Granting10 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court finds Plaintiff's attorney fee request reasonable and hereby awards Plaintiff $1,750.00 in attorney fees and costs pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(B)(iii). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that JUDGMENT be entered against Defendants RICHARD BRAD MARLATT AND POPPYS GRILL & CHILL LLC, Individually and as the alter ego of Poppy's Grill & Chill, in favor of JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC., in accordance with the foregoing, in the sum of $5,750.00 plus interest at 5% per annum from date of judgment. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/21/2019. (mdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
10 10 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Mon 07/22 12:41 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Richard Brad Marlatt and Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit Joe Hand Jr,
Att: 3 Exhibit to Joe Hand Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit Richard Marinelli,
Att: 5 Affidavit Jeffrey Koberg,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 05, 2019
9 9 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 07/05 8:37 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Richard Brad Marlatt, Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC (mdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
8 8 notice Application to Enter Default Wed 07/03 4:26 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Richard Brad Marlatt and Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC . (Koberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 06/04 9:14 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: Summons & complaint sent by regular U.S. mail to defendants Richard Brad Marlatt and Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC (kk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 05/22 2:44 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Richard Brad Marlatt. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
5 5 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 05/22 2:42 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate of Clerk Wed 04/24 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail to the Defendants: Richard Brad Marlatt,(7018 1830 0001 5087 7901) and Poppys Grill & Chill(7018 2290 0001 5982 2877). (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/18 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Richard Brad Marlatt and Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/15 9:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6841395), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Richard Marlatt,
Att: 3 Summons Form Poppy's Grill & Chill LLC