Morgan County, Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45075 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Eastern, 3:19-cv-00036 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Plaintiff
Morgan County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:32 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3870944.), filed by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
District Judge R Leon Jordan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys John Spragens, Elizabeth Cabraser, Bruce Leppla, Steven Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral are not admitted (see LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to John Spragens, Elizabeth Cabraser, Bruce Leppla, Steven Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral) (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman) (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019) | |
5 | 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman) (CAT) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 1/25/19. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge R Leon Jordan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/28/19. (JBR) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885637.) by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885666.) by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885676.) by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885679.) by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885637.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885676.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885679.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Paulina do Amaral's office contacted the Clerk's Office on 2/07/2019 re:10 PHV Motion and13 Notice of Deficiency. Counsel is in the process of requesting/receiving certificates of good standing from New York and California. (KMK, )[Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document:10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral . The Clerk's Office was able to verify her admission status with New York and California. Her name is spelled slightly different between databases. (KMK, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac)10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885666.) : The Clerks Office has been unable to confirm your good standing in the following state(s). Accordingly, a certificate(s) of good standing must be submitted: New York and California. (JBR, ) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Paulina do Amaral on 2/7/2019 (JBR, ). [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
14 | 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3886343.) by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3886343.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE of MDL Transfer Order (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. (JBR, ) [Transferred from tned on 2/15/2019.] | ||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00036. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |